Accounts and annual returns Nottingham Training & Education

Charity number: 1028281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 04 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 February 2025 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 August 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 04 April 2025 1039 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 March 2022 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 March 2022 282 days late Download Open in new window