Accounts and annual returns Friends of Hanham Woods Academy

Charity number: 1028333
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 September 2023 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 October 2022 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 March 2022 622 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required