Financial history Friends of Hanham Woods Academy

Charity number: 1028333
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.44k £2.76k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k
Total expenditure £4.65k £1.96k £1.04k £1.04k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A