Financial history ST PETERS PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £13.24k £13.37k £15.32k £3.50k £2.60k
Total expenditure £9.43k £10.14k £14.43k £2.75k £9.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A