MUCH HADHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (AFTERNOON)

Charity Number: 1028400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/training Arts/culture Sport/recreation Environment/conservation/heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £3,325
Total expenditure: £2,572

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Minturn Birkett Trustee 03 May 2023
THE FRIENDS OF WIDFORD CHURCH
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF WIDFORD SCHOOL
Received: On time
Susan Helen McEvoy Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
FRANCES MARGARET LUCK Trustee 04 May 2016
WIDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
JOYCE ELIZABETH SPACKMAN Trustee 11 May 2015
HERTFORDSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.69k £712 £1.26k £2.72k £3.33k
Total expenditure £1.64k £480 £1.40k £2.77k £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 23 July 2024 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 27 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HERTS FEDERATION OF W I'S
COUNTY HOUSE
29 HIGH STREET
WHEATHAMPSTEAD
HERTFORDSHIRE
AL4 8BB
Phone:
01582834010
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available