LITTLE MELTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs supervised playgroup sessions for pre-school children age 2 1/2 to school age, open every morning in term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- LITTLE MELTON PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Cooper-Brighting | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Hallier | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Carter-Mayers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Bayes | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Alice Mayers | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hawken | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.70k | £38.86k | £36.44k | £37.28k | £39.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.34k | £39.47k | £42.17k | £38.70k | £38.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.51k | £27.85k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Mill Road
Little Melton
Norwich
NR9 3NX
- Phone:
- 01603812362
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window