Financial history BOROUGH GREEN PARISH CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 1028484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.80k £11.26k £12.06k £9.12k £9.32k
Total expenditure £15.31k £9.49k £10.90k £13.77k £7.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A