Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF LYMINGTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1028522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £57.26k £52.56k £59.74k £48.40k £12.75k
Total expenditure £53.98k £56.34k £53.43k £56.84k £7.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £1.75k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £1.75k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k