BROADWAS BUMBLE BEES

Charity number: 1028662
Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a rural setting providing full day care for children ages 2-11 in a safe, fun and stimulating environment. We are in a purpose built building within the school grounds and we provide wrap around care for the school. At our last ofsted which was 2007 we received an outstanding for the quality and standards of the nursery education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020

Total income: £74,452
Total expenditure: £80,064

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Broadwas Bumblebees Committee (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Loveridge Chair 24 July 2020
None on record
Norman Macleod Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Turner Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Thea Allen Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Tynna Loveday Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Jackie Jones Trustee 27 November 2018
None on record
Jenny Walker Trustee 14 April 2018
None on record
Izzy Turner Trustee 09 July 2015
None on record
Emily Dimmick Trustee 04 July 2014
None on record
Christianne Wilde Trustee 04 July 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £69.85k £65.81k £60.56k £82.75k £74.45k
Total expenditure £66.98k £64.46k £62.43k £90.20k £80.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 March 2022 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 March 2022 245 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Broadwas Bumblebees Pre School
Broadwas
WORCESTER
WR6 5NE
Phone:
07817637241