Accounts and annual returns BAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1028789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 16 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required