BEDFORD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the rural community developing the members knowledge and experience in various aspects of their life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 23 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Benjamin O'Connor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Louise Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.75k | £3.18k | £26.13k | £19.98k | £23.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.95k | £3.83k | £11.14k | £9.21k | £15.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARG IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR FARM HOUSE
HIGH STREET
STAGSDEN
BEDFORD
MK43 8SQ
- Phone:
- 07498715405
- Email:
- jack4brown@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window