WINCANTON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1029009
Charity reporting is overdue by 239 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 February 2017 On time Download