THE FRIENDS OF BISHOPS WALTHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our focus is on furthering the education of the children of Bishops Waltham Junior School and enhancing the provision of facilities available to them. We seek to engage and forge links with the local community and host events which help to raise funds for the children of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 November 1993: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF RIDGEMEDE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Rothwell | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hutchinson | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Louisa Foulkes | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jordan | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Humphries | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Quita Walker | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Tibballs | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Chandler | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.90k | £13.76k | £5.62k | £11.14k | £29.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.49k | £10.24k | £3.44k | £9.24k | £12.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 November 2022 | 490 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2022 | 855 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 9 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHOPS WALTHAM JUNIOR SCHOOL
OAK ROAD
BISHOPS WALTHAM
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1EP
- Phone:
- 01489 892368
- Email:
- fobs@bwjsapps.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window