BEDFORDSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1029278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £104.68k £123.70k £135.10k £135.93k £142.18k
Total expenditure £95.76k £104.39k £120.96k £128.29k £127.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A