PENSFORD TODDLERS

Charity number: 1029329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a local toddler group providing activities for local families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024

Total income: £1,166
Total expenditure: £1,241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Knox Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £892 £612 £1.20k £1.14k £1.17k
Total expenditure £1.03k £889 £1.51k £1.34k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Publow Lane
Pensford
BRISTOL
BS39 4HW
Phone:
07967730357
Website:

No information available