BETTY MARTIN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN THE MIDHURST AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Clarke | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Shelagh Jane Legrave | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOANNA MARGARET LORIMER GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JAMES MCCAHEARTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOEL WILLIAM SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.10k | £26.42k | £31.25k | £28.18k | £26.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.16k | £27.88k | £47.76k | £33.20k | £26.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (SEE ALSO TRUST DEED) APPLICANTS MUST BE RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX AND PREFERENCE WILL BE GIVEN TO APPLICANTS WHO RESIDE WITHIN A RADIUS OF 15 MILES FROM THE PARISH CHURCH IN MIDHURST, WEST SUSSEX
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashfield House
7 Ashfield Close
MIDHURST
- Phone:
- 01730815020
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window