BURY ST EDMUNDS YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029504
Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 82 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 82 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 447 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 447 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 813 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 813 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required