BURY ST EDMUNDS YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029504
Charity reporting is overdue by 812 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £9.77k £5.47k £9.77k £12.22k £14.28k
Total expenditure £10.62k £5.27k £10.62k £12.20k £11.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0