Financial history CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES

Charity number: 1029693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £65.60k £52.53k £46.54k £38.92k £20.02k
Total expenditure £58.61k £37.85k £35.78k £21.71k £10.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £4.00k