Trustees CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES

Charity number: 1029693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Quayle Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Rachel Louise Margaret Pigott Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Zoe Fox Trustee 21 January 2021
None on record
Paula McPeake Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Alison Williams Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Ann Jones Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Isabel Blore Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Lynn Denney Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
jennifer maxwell Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Brenda Lewis Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Anna Patterson Trustee 13 January 2018
None on record
JACQUELINE DUFFIELD Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
ELIZABETH JOY TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2014
NEWCIS
Received: On time
Ellen Ruth Davies Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
Megan Andrea Jones Trustee
None on record