FOWEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1029712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Jenkinson Chair 04 November 2019 None on record
Samantha Jane Hawke Trustee 04 November 2019 None on record
Julia Elizabeth Provis Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
Rhianna Cooke Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
JOANNE MARGARET LISTER Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Amy Louise Fernie Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
ITA ALICE HIRST Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
Joanna Reed Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Mark Alan Nile Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
Dr AMY ELIZABETH MILLER Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record