Accounts and annual returns THATCHAM ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required