Financial history THATCHAM ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £17.04k £11.56k £14.28k £9.58k £11.29k
Total expenditure £17.78k £11.36k £14.13k £10.69k £7.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A