ST ANNES PLAYGROUP AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1029840
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 843 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 843 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required