ST ANNES PLAYGROUP AND TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1029840
Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £18.23k £13.35k £14.15k £12.54k £13.48k
Total expenditure £17.70k £13.59k £14.21k £12.65k £12.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £8.48k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0