HOLME VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1029847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.43k £39.77k £2.27k £9.30k £3.15k
Total expenditure £23.06k £31.69k £8.86k £7.63k £4.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A