HOLME VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1029847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Juliette Walker Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
LESLIE CHADWICK Trustee 01 January 2017
BEAUMONT AND JESSOP RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Michael Jessop Trustee 11 June 2020
44TH HUDDERSFIELD {KIRKHEATON} SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
1ST HUDDERSFIELD (EMLEY) SCOUT AND CUB GROUP Received: On time
HUDDERSFIELD SOUTH EAST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Alan Whitwham Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
Christopher Michael Penn Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Stephen James Molloy Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
DAVID THOMPSON Trustee None on record
ANDREW ARMITAGE Trustee None on record
Lauren Breslin Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
JUDITH ALISON ROBERTS Trustee 18 July 2019
7TH HOLME VALLEY (NETHERTHONG) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
DAVID ANDREW GILL Trustee 11 June 2020
HUDDERSFIELD SOUTH EAST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time