SOUTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training for retired people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 December 1993: Standard registration
- SOUTH BUCKS U3A (Working name)
- BEACONSFIELD AND DISTRICT U3A (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Bernard Searing | Chair | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Hawkins | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Shan Morrell Searing | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Wright | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Rosa Harrison | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Margaret Hurst | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.88k | £16.22k | £11.23k | £33.78k | £27.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.28k | £7.21k | £12.73k | £33.93k | £29.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 21/02/2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH BUCKS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Ivins Road
BEACONSFIELD
Buckinghamshire
HP9 1DS
- Phone:
- 01494670015
- Email:
- secretary@sbu3a.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window