Financial history OAKS LADIES CLUB

Charity number: 1029932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £6.49k £5.47k £7.13k £3.84k £3.84k
Total expenditure £6.85k £5.30k £5.08k £1.56k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A