SOUTH MOLTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings to carry out informal learning activities e.g. local history Art History also Physical activities e.g. Walking Croquet and social contacts e.g. monthly Coffee Mornings with Speaker And Sunday Lunch goup. We also arrange trips to the theatre and gardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 10 December 1993: Standard registration
- SOUTH MOLTON U 3 A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Wheelan | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brickwood | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cooper | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Ambrose Benjamin | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Annette Christine Stevens | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dunkley | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Saunders | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Freeman | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Overall | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £3.03k | £2.19k | £3.76k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £2.38k | £2.71k | £6.28k | £4.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED AT AN AGM DATED 11 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH MOLTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Acorns
Blakeshill Road
Landkey
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX32 0FD
- Phone:
- 07958 363301
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window