Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF INGATESTONE CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1030452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £16.32k £24.72k £24.97k £23.23k £9.68k
Total expenditure £24.33k £12.61k £4.59k £19.01k £12.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A