EMMANUEL SCHOOL EXETER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1030485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 August 2019 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required