Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LOCKS HEATH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1030518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 May 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 August 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required