Trustees NATIONAL JUSTICE MUSEUM
Charity number: 1030554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BOWDEN LLB LLM | Chair | 10 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Ann Chapman | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Somerville | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Williams | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hastie | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Struan Duncan Campbell | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
His Honour Roger Graham Chapple | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Blair | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
HIS HONOUR JONATHAN JAMES TEARE | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SPENCER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL ROBERT MATHEWS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.