ASHOVER WI

Charity number: 1030627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.33k £3.83k £3.84k £3.44k £1.21k
Total expenditure £4.30k £3.55k £2.95k £4.70k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A