REGAIN - THE TRUST FOR SPORTS TETRAPLEGICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to support tetraplegics lead independent and fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 1993: Standard registration
- THE TREVOR JONES TETRAPLEGIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD IVAR MOUNTBATTEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ivan Jones | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Smith | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Killick | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miles Quentin Dean | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL COLEMAN | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360.19k | £71.13k | £77.47k | £92.78k | £83.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.09k | £132.60k | £114.19k | £136.54k | £152.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/12/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE INDIVIDUALS WHO, AS A RESULT OF:(I) AN ACCIDENT WHILST ENGAGED IN A SPORTING OR LEISURE ACTIVITY OR (II) A ROAD TRAFFIC ACCIDENT (RTA), SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING RESTRICTIONS (A) THAT THE CHARITY, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, HAS AVAILABLE FUNDS (B) THAT THE RECIPIENT OF THE GRANT IS CURRENTLY, OR WAS ACTIVE, IN SPORTS AND (C) SUCH RTA GRANTS ARE LIMITED TO A MAXIMUM OF 4 IN ANY GIVEN CALENDAR YEAR. HAVE SUFFERED SPINAL INJURY, RESULTING IN TETRAPLEGIA; TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE SUFFERED INJURIES AS DEFINED ABOVE BY THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES OR EQUIPMENT; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE KNOWLEDGE OF SPINAL INJURIES WHICH MAY BE SUFFERED BY INDIVIDUALS IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Howe Close
Shenley
RADLETT
Hertfordshire
WD7 9JF
- Phone:
- 07572 841861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window