Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 September 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2019 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2018 11 October 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 21 September 2017 23 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2017 Not Required