Financial history WILDFOWL AND WETLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1030884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.41m £23.96m £24.42m £25.70m £20.87m
Total expenditure £23.04m £23.73m £24.82m £26.85m £20.38m
Income from government contracts £178.00k £19.38k £94.76k £193.96k £346.95k
Income from government grants £862.00k £262.11k £621.68k £1.01m £3.99m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73m £5.91m £4.43m £4.33m £7.71m
Income - Other trading activities £5.17m £4.98m £5.24m £4.86m £1.50m
Income - Charitable activities £13.13m £12.78m £14.45m £16.22m £11.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £353.00k £287.00k £279.00k £285.00k £226.00k
Income - Other £31.00k £0 £19.00k £6.00k £3.00k
Income - Legacies £1.73m £3.60m £2.30m £2.23m £1.48m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.36m £17.67m £18.51m £20.67m £15.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.67m £6.06m £6.32m £6.18m £4.49m
Expenditure - Governance £267.00k £249.00k £297.00k £268.00k £198.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £53.00k £88.00k £78.00k £54.00k £58.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0