WILDFOWL AND WETLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1030884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Tudor Trustee 25 November 2021 None on record
Simon Tonge Trustee 01 October 2014
DAMBARI WILDLIFE TRUST (UK) Received: On time
Alexander Daniel Mawer Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
BARNABY BRIGGS Trustee 13 December 2011 None on record
Sarah Pearson Trustee 25 November 2021 None on record
Fraser Stewart Montgomery Trustee 25 November 2021 None on record
Alan Bahadur Law Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
ANDREW DAVID BEER Trustee 05 October 2017
ROUNDHOUSE BIRMINGHAM Received: On time
Martin Philip Birch Trustee 01 October 2015 None on record
Hester Scott Liakos Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
Luminita Holban Trustee 25 November 2021
ECOTRANSYLVANIA Received: On time
ANCIENT TREE FORUM Received: On time