Accounts and annual returns FORMBY WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1030886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 March 2022 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 October 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 02 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required