Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ALDE VALLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 December 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required