Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY ABBOTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £40.82k £54.96k £37.37k £51.01k £40.53k
Total expenditure £33.82k £30.91k £32.14k £54.05k £31.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A