Financial history DODDINGTON RECREATION COMMITTEE (CLAPHAM COMMON) CLUB

Charity number: 1031251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.15k £17.78k £16.54k £13.94k £23.42k
Total expenditure £10.36k £10.23k £11.20k £11.37k £17.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k