WHEATCROFT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1031308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £39.96k £67.56k £77.09k £81.53k £77.58k
Total expenditure £37.01k £51.17k £55.32k £69.82k £66.48k
Income from government contracts £24.94k £52.39k £65.41k £63.36k £68.05k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A