WHEATCROFT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1031308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karl Ward Chair 02 November 2016 None on record
Sarah Dennis Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Kris Parker Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Lauren Temple Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
Amanda Campbell Trustee 03 February 2016 None on record
Rhona Marshall Trustee 21 October 2015 None on record
Merriem Ouchtati Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
Stacey Austin Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
Samantha Parker Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Stacey Silby Trustee 17 May 2018 None on record