BERRYNARBOR PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1031351
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 September 2018 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2018 80 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 18 September 2018 445 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2018 445 days late Download