BERRYNARBOR PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1031351
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £19.48k £37.71k £36.78k £31.51k £56.95k
Total expenditure £21.83k £39.80k £38.48k £32.84k £45.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A