Financial history THE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE (TEC)

Charity number: 1031482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £461.95k £400.69k £502.29k £729.03k £802.06k
Total expenditure £482.66k £555.42k £548.02k £730.22k £749.55k
Income from government contracts £120.00k £226.18k £202.87k £225.21k £337.34k
Income from government grants £41.70k £17.42k £6.00k £140.34k £126.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £460 £5.60k £20.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £501.49k £705.05k £781.89k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £339 £74 £18
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £18.31k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £548.02k £730.22k £749.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.35k £17.86k £2.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0