Financial history ADDISCOMBE NEIGHBOURHOOD CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031601
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.20k £24.39k £31.34k £24.50k £26.56k
Total expenditure £39.19k £36.60k £29.63k £24.54k £28.32k
Income from government contracts £16.00k N/A £21.66k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.60k N/A £21.66k £21.72k