Accounts and annual returns ALBERBURY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1031865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 23 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required